Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BADSHOT LEA AND HALE
Charity number: 1128239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BRIAN WALTER | Chair | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Alan Shatwell | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Antony Camp | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Anne Marsham | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Margaret Bull | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Susan Chapman | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Herbert Myers | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Weston | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kay | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Munroe | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stella Wiseman | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KRIS ANNE LAWRENCE | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.