Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL, AUGHTON LIVERPOOL
Charity number: 1128623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANDREW ARTHUR HOUSLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joyce Turner | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Moss | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Adrian Ball | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Makepeace | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Cross | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane McEvoy | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Hampson | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet SMITH | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DENIS O'BRIEN | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Helen CONNELLY | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Williams | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela O'Brien | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Margaret Florence ELLAMS | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN BEARON | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES VIVIAN PARSONS MA, MBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BRIAN DEVONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BILL GLENNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN FOGDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.