Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET, LEIGH ON SEA
Charity number: 1130679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Victor Wylie | Chair | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geoffrey Maddox | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David William Stowe | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Green | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONALD HUGH ALEXANDER FRASER | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MAY | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE BRIDGE | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER HERBERT FISHER | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE BAYNES B.ED (HONS) | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.