Trustees BAILDON METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1128664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gwyneth Marie Jackson | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart Binks | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Darnbrook | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Bairstow | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Heather Grace Clark-Coates | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Anne Pollard | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel James | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Elizabeth Jankowicz | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elliott James Cahill | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Elisabeth Cahill | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Stephen Picken | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE LAWSON | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN VALERIE JACKSON | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN LAWSON | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA ARKELL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GARETH RUSSELL JAMES | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christine Crabtree | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Peter Howard Jackson | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|||||
JANET BINKS | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE NOTT | Trustee | 25 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev PHILIP DRAKE NIGEL | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|||||
RALPH ALLEN POLLARD | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mervyn Robert Flecknoe | Trustee | 06 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROS JUNE CROSLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASHLEY RICHARD FRANCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev NICK BLUNDELL B.A. HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE JILLIAN FLECKNOE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.