ENFIELD SAHELI

Charity number: 1129308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £93.22k £59.70k £69.97k £103.59k £83.06k
Total expenditure £93.05k £84.89k £83.47k £98.01k £106.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £89.76k £50.11k £53.63k £53.33k £77.15k