Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES WEYBRIDGE
Charity number: 1130714

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAMIAN STEWART HARRISON-MILES | Chair | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mason | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH LANGSTON | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SCRIVENER | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES MASON | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES IVOR MICHAEL BERESFORD | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GILLAM-SMITH | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIET ELIZABETH MARSH | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Wilson Miller | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ALAN JAMES KNOWLES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRETCHEN SPALT | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES BURSTON | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lindy Anne Fozard | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|||||
SUSAN KATHLEEN RUBIDGE | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WICKS | Trustee | 03 December 2013 |
|
|||||
JANE HAMILTON ALEXANDER | Trustee | 03 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEILL WILLIAM RUBIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.