Trustees MARSHALSWICK BAPTIST FREE CHURCH
Charity number: 1129235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Darren Street | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danny Smith | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Suzanne Tocher | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Grace Little | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ka Lok Fong | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Ramsay Allan | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET PAYNE | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE AGNES CRUTCHFIELD | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Drake | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.