Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL IN THE HAMLET WITH ST. ANDREW
Charity number: 1129099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Keith Hitchman | Chair | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Pritchard | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Pulford | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Baines | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Grace | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Jackson | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Johnson | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christina Barrett-Yuen | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD GIDDINGS | Trustee | 28 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BUSH | Trustee | 28 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MCCALL | Trustee | 28 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CATH PARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVE PATMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL CRAGG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.