THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE BLESSED VIRGIN, PLYMPTON

Charity number: 1128769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS MILA COLLIER Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
MR SAM SNELLING Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
MR JACK DUCKWORTH Trustee 10 September 2013 None on record
Jane Lois Banbury Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
DEBORAH CHRISTINE TOZER Trustee None on record
LUCY MERCIA CATHLEEN SKINNER Trustee None on record
PHILIP JOHN SMITH Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
MAVIS BUTTLE Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
Christine Harris Trustee 28 October 2020 None on record
Christopher Michael Bunney Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record
MARY KATHRYN NICHOLLS Trustee None on record
Robert John Harrison Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record
Richard Hinton Wakerell Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Rev Robert Douglas Harris Chair 09 March 2016 None on record
MIKE LEWIS Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
CLAIRE-LOUISE JOURNEAUX Trustee 22 April 2015 None on record
RODGER RUSE Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
Keith Ronald Peter Escott Trustee 28 October 2020 None on record