Accounts and annual returns OASIS CARDIFF

Charity number: 1131306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window