Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES PADDINGTON
Charity number: 1134640

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zachary Joseph Barnett | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID CHARLES JOHN BANKS | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Alexandria Tokarska | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Silkstone | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
James Kenyon | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sir David Madel | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
George Robert Francis de Voil | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lorna Anne Harrison | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Daveshka Rekawa | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Oluwatosin Opsyemi Ajayi | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Jonathan Crawford | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
THE REVD OWEN JAMES DOBSON | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Lesley Hetherington | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Lloyd | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN GEOFFREY GORDON MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARY MARGARET CATHERINE LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.