Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST
Charity number: 1129449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY WHITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gill Adams | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Cook | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kippax | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Burdett | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Main | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Chandler | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Patricia Hyam | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Harris | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Godwin | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Clive Boys | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Green | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Crane | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.