Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKES REDCLIFFE GARDENS
Charity number: 1130681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David John Matthews | Chair | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wangari Thuo | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Vaudrey | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RUTH NATHAN | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Maani | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ion Ciabanu | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Will Taylor-Jackson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Will Haggard | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
GB Ladipo | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Howard-Comber | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abolade Oladunni Alfred | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colmon Tuul | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.