Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GLASTONBURY ST JOHN, GLASTONBURY
Charity number: 1129016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DAVID LAURENCE GUNARY MACGEOCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David John Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Godfrey Paul Snell | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward John MacGeoch | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Jane Harkness | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Valentine Randall | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth John Heazell M.A. | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Dorey | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joy Taylor | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Henry Way | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY MASTERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.