Accounts and annual returns ROYAL COLLEGE OF DEFENCE STUDIES (RCDS) OFFICERS' MESS
Charity number: 1129968
Charity reporting is up to date (243 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 February 2024 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 February 2024 | 243 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2024 | 608 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2024 | 608 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 18 December 2019 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2018
(These accounts |
18 December 2019 | 171 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window