Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS, SWANMORE
Charity number: 1128899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Christa Stuart SAJO | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Lawrence Bakewell | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Dyer | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Louise Singleton | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derrinda Ann Laing | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Vost | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Frampton | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allison May Gurry | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David MarK Lee | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Newbold | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Branson | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jenny Sharpe | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JANET CHANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JOHN WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.