Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ABINGDON-ON-THAMES

Charity number: 1129833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV. DR. E MILLER Chair
FRIENDS OF ST HELEN, ABINGDON
Received: On time
ST NICOLAS SCHOOL AND EDUCATION TRUST ABINGDON
Overdue by 32 days
David James Pope Trustee 20 April 2023
FRIENDS OF ST HELEN, ABINGDON
Received: On time
THAMES VALE YOUTH ORCHESTRA TRUST
Received: On time
THE ABINGDON PASSION PLAY
Received: On time
PAUL HEINZ RAST-LINDSELL Trustee 20 April 2023
ST NICOLAS SCHOOL AND EDUCATION TRUST ABINGDON
Overdue by 32 days
Jennifer Ann Smith Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Kate Elisabeth Burland Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Rev Rosalind Elisabeth Rutherford Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Jennifer Elaine Fishpool Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Dr Hazel Glennie Trustee 28 April 2022
THE GERONTIUS AMENITY FUND
Received: On time
Dr Gwyneth Helen Lewis Trustee 29 April 2021
HANDS ON FOR MOTHERS AND BABIES
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Martina Read Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Louise Heffernan Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Joyce Elizabeth Kelly Trustee 04 April 2019
THE ABINGDON PASSION PLAY
Received: On time
Rev Jennifer Elizabeth Brown Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record
Gwendoline Mary Bevington Trustee 18 November 2018
None on record
Alexandra Rachel Chloe Scott Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
LINDA MAY HOBBS Trustee 18 April 2017
FRIENDS OF ST HELEN, ABINGDON
Received: On time
Alexandra Elizabeth Green Trustee 28 April 2016
None on record
John CLARE Trustee 23 April 2015
THE ABINGDON PASSION PLAY
Received: On time
Susan Frances Scott Trustee 10 April 2014
None on record
Rev PAUL SMITH Trustee 15 October 2013
None on record
Mari Eluned Hallas Trustee 31 October 2011
ABINGDON STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
ST NICOLAS SCHOOL AND EDUCATION TRUST ABINGDON
Overdue by 32 days