Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL, BOSTON SPA

Charity number: 1129350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £43.96k £39.85k £41.69k £38.88k £2.43k
Total expenditure £34.92k £21.73k £30.90k £32.77k £12.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A