Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, EATON BRAY WITH EDLESBOROUGH
Charity number: 1129952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Joy Elizabeth Cousans | Chair | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
HILARY COLERIDGE JACKSON | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Anne Jones | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gaye Soule | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Fountain | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Robert Hayden | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richard Banks | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Revd Dr Stephen Russell Burge | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Edward QUINN | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA DIANE MORTON | Trustee | 07 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
GORDON GRAY BEM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE TERESA HAYDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.