Trustees THORNBURY & DISTRICT STROKE SUPPORT GROUP
Charity number: 1129777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Davis | Chair | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michele Sylvia Lee Lime | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Irene Dawson | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anita Mann | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judy Draper | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Cook | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Brennan | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Spiller | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Bailey | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.