Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, WOODBRIDGE, SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1129672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katharine Turner Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Philip Robert Poole Trustee 20 July 2021
None on record
Margaret Davidson Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Janice Poulson Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Michelle Bullard Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
JOANNE LOVETT Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
DAVID BERRIDGE Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Rev Nigel John Prior Trustee 24 August 2020
SAYERS CHARITY
Overdue by 227 days
Jeremy HAWKSLEY Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
Rita Gladys James Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
STEPHEN HARWOOD COLE Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
SIMON MORRIS Trustee 17 May 2016
None on record
DILYS MARY HARE Trustee 20 October 2013
None on record
BARBARA STEAR Trustee 30 September 2013
None on record
DAVID SHARPLES Trustee 10 July 2012
SAYERS CHARITY
Overdue by 227 days
LODGE OF PERFECT FRIENDSHIP NO 376 MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
VERONICA ANN HOWE Trustee
WALTER BLOXSOME'S GIFT
Received: On time
PENELOPE JANE BIRD Trustee
None on record