Trustees 1ST WOODBRIDGE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1130358
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Thomas Whiffin | Chair | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Catherine Roodhouse | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Margery Ward | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Christopher Needs | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Harris | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne June Jones | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Howard Clouter | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Rudge | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENISE THORPE | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adam Thorpe | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.