Trustees DEVONPORT HIGH SCHOOL FOR BOYS PARENT,TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1130846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abi Carlton | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Smitta Tripani | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lianne Ruberry | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Duke | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julianne Pearce | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Kinsella | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Smale | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Spencer | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|||||
DAN ROBERTS | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Bowden | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.