Trustees ST ANDREWS WITH CASTLE GATE NOTTINGHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1129944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Graham Deryck John Jennings | Chair |
|
||||||
Jean Frances Patterson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ruth Jennings | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Wild | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr KENNETH JAMES MAXWELL | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sally Allen | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Coupland | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Armitage | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Critchley Kenyon | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Christopher James Ford | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Marie Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Gaunt | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Graham | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Lindsey Logan | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lorraine Logan | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hutchinson | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr NOEL EDWARD WORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.