Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARKS, TALBOT VILLAGE, BOURNEMOUTH
Charity number: 1131282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lyndsey Elaine Wilson | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Williams | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Leonard Broom | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Harrison | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Gray | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Moyse | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ann Lee | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marion Marks | Trustee | 23 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN WAY | Trustee | 21 July 2013 |
|
|||||
VALERIE COX | Trustee | 21 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PAUL JAMES | Trustee | 18 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR PHILIP ADAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ERNEST HUMPHREYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN JANE DIVALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.