Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, CHEADLE HULME

Charity number: 1130324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Lesley Anne Selby Trustee 10 April 2022
THE STOCKPORT SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Joshua Thomas Baxter Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Sarah Frances Brown Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Dr Patricia Mary Dunlop Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Jean Elizabeth Davies Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Felicity Ann Tucker Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Helen Mary Price Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Diane Joan Turner Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Moira Helen Mary Jackson Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Dr Geoffrey Michael Cooke Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Alma Budd Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Margaret CLERC Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Jane Elizabeth HOLLAND Trustee 12 October 2019
None on record
Philip Peter Readdy Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
paul clifford Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
RUTH DRURY Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Joan Shaw Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Jenny Wildsmith Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Barbara Farrar Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Adrienne Irene Staines Trustee 09 February 2015
None on record
Hazel Boustany Trustee 09 February 2015
None on record
Lisa Louise Irvine Trustee 09 February 2015
None on record
DAVID ANTHONY BENNETT Trustee 11 May 2011
None on record
PROF PETER LESLIE SELBY Trustee
None on record
ARTHUR LANGFORD JACKSON Trustee
None on record