Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NURSLING WITH ROWNHAMS
Charity number: 1130927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Graeme Dixon | Chair | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Pennells | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Phelps | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Beak | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevan Abernathy | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Crawford White | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Harris | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Owen | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JEAN PURKESS | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Randell John William McKay | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Richard Jones | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Lynn Black | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John David Sofrin | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARY JONES | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ROSEMARY SKIDMORE | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA WRIGHT | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Glennis Marilyn Gould | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.