Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, HADDENHAM
Charity number: 1132319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Cassandra Messervy | Chair | 22 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Timothy Eric Shaw | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Thomas William Elston | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Vanessa Elston | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Goves | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Fell | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Nurse FRSA | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Howard Charles Roberts | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Gordon Douglas McCallum Lawson | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
REV Philip Neil Groves | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE WALKER | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev JONATHAN DESMOND HAWKINS | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
TRISH MANDER | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
LORAINE ANNE MILMER | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE PAMELA HEADLONG | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DIANNE BRACKLEY BSC | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.