Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, RICHMOND WITH ST MATTHIAS AND ST JOHN THE DIVINE
Charity number: 1130018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev WILMA ROEST MA | Chair | 25 July 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Joseph Moore | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Fay Johnstone | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Mary-Margaret Cimino | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Arabella Marion Ruth HOBSON | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
David Powell | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
David John BARTLETT | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Thomas KELSEY | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
John Buckingham | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
STEPHEN BROWN | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
GILL DOLING | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
HELEN KELSEY | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
SALLY HELEN CRANDON-GILL | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
RENEE FLETCHER | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MARGOT GALLIE | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev CHARLOTTE EMILY MIDDLETON | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Alison Grace Hall | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr EMMA LOUISE MEREDITH | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Fiona Eleanor Jane MORGAN | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev ANNE ELIZABETH CRAWFORD | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MARY ELIZABETH ATWILL RICKETTS | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.