Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN AND ST LUKE, BILTON, HARROGATE
Charity number: 1132843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SIMON PAUL DOWSON | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN CLARKE | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Golightly | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALETHEA FRY | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Louise Iles BSc Hons | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jan Lizbeth Johnson BSc, PhD | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Laura Mary Martin MSc, DipHE | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Bath | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NOEL JAMES DUKE | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NETHERWOOD BROWN MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE ELIZABETH REICHERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL THOMPSON BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE WISE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.