Trustees LION WALK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1132811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KENNETH MCARTHUR FORBES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Colin Baldock | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
LINDA HART | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Baldock | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Frederiksen | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Ray | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Freestone | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hurford | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Jones | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abimbola Oshisanwo | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Tomkinson | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Brooks | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Boddy | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Serena Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Roxby | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.