CITIZENS FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1131316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 July 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 24 August 2017 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required