Trustees MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL
Charity number: 500374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isobel Mary Gilbertson | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Mary Morgan | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Anne Irene Wilde | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Barbara Mary Watkins | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane O'Gorman | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Michael Ian Orsmond | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Laurence William Anderson | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
|
||||
Mary ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.