Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITEHAVEN, ST. JAMES

Charity number: 1130849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Alison Jane Dobell Chair 11 September 2023
WHITEHAVEN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Susan Kitchen Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Anne Blamire Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Donna Louise Flitcroft Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Richard Charles Last Trustee 12 July 2020
None on record
David Steven Flitcroft Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
Paul Stephen Cox Trustee 09 April 2017
None on record
Alison Mary Last Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record
JANE ELIZABETH NICOLSON Trustee
None on record
DOROTHY GRAHAM Trustee
WHITEHAVEN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ANNA CHRISTINE MARY JONES Trustee
None on record