Trustees THE MUDLARKS COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1132403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Mandy Halligan | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Guinn | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Smith | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Harding | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Murphy | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wilson | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
STUART ROSS ACMA | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Bullen | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alison Janet Voyle | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.