Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF REDLAND, BRISTOL
Charity number: 1131061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William James Fairbairn | Chair | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Haynes | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danny Ma | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gill Dann | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Rabbitt | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Brothwood | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Milne | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Wayne Cullum | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Salisbury | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Elizabeth Vause | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roy Leslie Alan Hussey | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Clare Walton | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alan Barr | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Louise PITTS | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Steven Faux | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID NEVILLE CLARKE | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr Kathleen Clare NICHOLS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.