Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, FULWOOD
Charity number: 1131890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Boland | Chair | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Elizabeth Anne Bailey | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Nixon | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sue Walsh | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Patrick Hickey | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MANDY HARRIET STANTON | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Phil Maudsley | Trustee | 26 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ELIZABETH LAING | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADAM DOUGLAS THOMAS | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET DIANE GHORI | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Porter | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Chris Hedley | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BLAKE HEDLEY BSC HONS | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JAYNE SWARBRICK BA HONS | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN WILLIAM BAILEY | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE ANN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA KOZIARSKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH MALLORY CAMERON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ANTHONY JORDAN BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH ARTHUR CURPHEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.