Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HARPENDEN ST. JOHN
Charity number: 1131603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Jean Pritchard | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ritah Namakula | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
The Venerable Andrew Edgar Ballard | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Frances Crowley | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Ruth Bygrave | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Bernard Meldrum | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Pitman ACMA | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Hugh Vickers | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Newell | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Nye | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Elizabeth Macdonald | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Paul Luckett | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Bryan Andrew Coventry | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Alan Myers | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David William Nye | Trustee |
|
||||||
LAURYN EARLE AWBREY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.