Financial history SHAHJALAL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1132107
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £30.80k £29.35k £21.23k £8.09k £219.03k
Total expenditure £7.85k £8.94k £18.03k £8.30k £20.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A