Trustees ROCK BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1135133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Griffin | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Lancaster | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Abraham | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Matthew Peckham | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Proffitt | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hayden-Smith | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ACKROYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENFORD MAPP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.