AMANA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1139140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.43k £3.84k £4.22k £6.71k £6.16k
Total expenditure £1.18k £817 £1.95k £1.82k £6.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A