Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, MILTON-NEXT-GRAVESEND
Charity number: 1130741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANDREW DAVEY | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN OSBORNE | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Parsonson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KIRBY | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Read | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DONOVAN | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|||||
SUSAN REILLY | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Shoesmith | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LUCY MARIE HORNBY | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANICE MAUREEN OSBORNE | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV JACQUELINE PATRICIA LITTLEWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA ELIZABETH BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA RUTH KIRBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW NAILOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN JOSEPH HUMPHRIES | Trustee |
|
||||||
VERONICA ANN READ | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.