Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST KNUTSFORD
Charity number: 1131500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV NIGEL TERENCE ATKINSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Emily Mary Pegg | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jones | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Barbara Evans | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Ainsworth | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robertson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
David Broadbent | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elaine Tamkin | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Locke | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Dally | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas Richard Hollingsbee | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE KITCHER | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andy Worth | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thain Flowers | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN LEE | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE WOODS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE BROADBENT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.