Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE WITH ST MARTIN, POYNTON, CHESTER
Charity number: 1133696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew Swires-Hennessy | Chair | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Christopher Holden | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Audrey Golding | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ruth Arthur | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Brain | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ruth Prince | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Brackenbury | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Irene Kershaw | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Coleman | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Fiona Mary Bowles | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Margaret Goode | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christine Judith Buckley | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Victoria Timothy | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Metcalfe | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Gail Parry | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Bell | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Walker | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Hutchinson | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ANDREW CLARKE | Trustee | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR DAVE MCCLELLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN SHORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE CORLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE MARGARET VIBRANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CHARLES MYERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.