Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST JOHN & ST ANNE, LANCASTER
Charity number: 1131372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Leah Beverley Vasey-Saunders | Chair | 08 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Louis Johnson | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Atkinson Russell | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Tio Kagana Duffield | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Patricia Heppenstall MBBS PhD | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Davis Lewis MB FRCEM | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Margaret Simpson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Kimberly Nerys Robinson | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Dickinson | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin Hopwood | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Malik George Salameh FCMI FIOD | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROF JOHN PHILIP DICKINSON MA MSC PHD | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
BAVERLEY DAWN ROBERTS | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GREENWOOD | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dame Pauline Fielding | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARY WITT | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICK WALKER | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|||||
David John Redmore | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mills Nicholson | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr AWENA ELIZABETH CARTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR RICHARD GEOFFREY CARTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARBARA ANN GARDNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
LOIS CLARE KIRTLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CANON CHRISTINE MULLINEAUX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.