Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEXHAM ABBEY
Charity number: 1132444
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Charles Glover | Chair | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Wendy Marilyn Nott | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Roger Brown | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Vivien Drydon | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY MAY | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Malcolm Thompson | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
LYNNE DENISE THOMSON | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Rowell | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JUNE OLLIVER | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Frances Stride | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Michael Thornton | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
William Oliver Charles Tyson | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Janet Finnon | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Stephen Mitchell | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
CAROL WILSON | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Marion Susan Milner MBE | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN JANE PIKETT TIMPERLEY | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
RACHAEL JANE HAYWOOD SMITH | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.