Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT CONGLETON

Charity number: 1133041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £62.18k £49.29k £51.66k £42.11k £36.34k
Total expenditure £56.09k £37.59k £63.41k £43.65k £35.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A