Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ANCHORSHOLME ALL SAINTS
Charity number: 1132756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR. B. ROWE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Anthony James Barnshaw | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Lee Green | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norma Anne Elkington | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Emma McNab | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Myra Ashworth | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christie Joi Atkinson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs E Bate | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs J Barlow | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs S Watson | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs C Pawson | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs J Green | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS Y DAVIES | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ANTHONY WATSON | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRANT DAVIES | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS. J.ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mr S Wardle | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR S. GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.