Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASHTEAD
Charity number: 1132244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Jane Wylie | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Barham | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Main Heywood | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Christine Bailey | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Elizabeth Hide | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Aline Fawdington | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Alison Tapp | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Levinsohn | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Bethany Joan Eckley | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Margaret Jane Boniface | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ireland Wadey | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cook | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RENEW | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CARTER | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Thornton | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
RUPERT REA | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALISON ANDERSON | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Arch | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Newhouse | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Whitehead | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Susan Dusmohamed | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Philip James Arnold | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Liz Marlow | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM STUART LEIGHTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD JOHN MILTON-WORSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.