Trustees CHARITYCOMMS
Charity number: 1138312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Russell | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Saskia Konynenburg | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Mazin | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Ambrose | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ipek Leni Candan | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Welsh | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Anthony Radmore | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vishnee Sauntoo | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Curtis-James Marshall | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Kirsty Marrins | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.